|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. | SLS/194606 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2849 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2489 |
||
20/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) | ||
05/1946 | Modification | Modification: Converted to oil burnng | ||
18/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4803 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) | ||
04/1949 | Modification | Modification: Oil burning equipment removed | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2849 | ||
23/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
28/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Didcot (81E) | ||
03/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2849 | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |