Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 129 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 6263 Month
» 234147 Year
» 1455712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2857 m/e 05/1918

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 210
Works Number 2763
To Service During 05/1918
Withdrawal Thu 25/04/1963
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
STB Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 31/12/1949
84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1955
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 14/06/1958
84B Oxley 4w/e 21/02/1959
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 18/04/1959
82C Swindon 4w/e 10/09/1960
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 22/04/1961
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 09/09/1961
88J Aberdare 4w/e 24/02/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn 25/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 25/01/1947
ALLOC STB Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 84C Banbury m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 12/07/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 22/04/1961
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   4w/e 04/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2857
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2763
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (STB)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
25/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 2857    

prev prev