Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3851 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22762 Week
» 87716 Month
» 290380 Year
» 3317233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Original) |
183 |
m/e |
07/1905 |
Great Western Railway |
2983 |
on |
28/12/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
Saint |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
158 |
Works Number |
2130 |
To Service |
During 07/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 19/03/1946 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1905 |
CDF |
|
Cardiff Canton |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/03/1946 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
TYS |
Tyseley |
m/e |
31/03/1946 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1909 |
D4 boiler fitted |
10/1910 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 183 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2130 |
|
|
09/1906 |
Naming |
Named 'RED GAUNTLET' |
|
|
12/1909 |
Modification |
Modification: D4 boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
28/12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2983 |
|
|
06/1915 |
Naming |
Renamed 'REDGAUNTLET' |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
19/03/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2983 |
|
|