Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1773 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15179 Week
» 68195 Month
» 187722 Year
» 3214575 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
193 |
m/e |
11/1890 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E193 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
193 |
m/e |
03/1935 |
British Railways |
30193 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
01/1925 |
BR Black |
Red and White |
05/1953 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
B3 |
To Service |
During 11/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/04/1962 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1948 |
General |
Locomotives with smokebox number plates include: Nos. 30193, 30521/70, 30696, 30856/61, 30950, 32095, 34012/18. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1890 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 193 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E193 |
|
|
03/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 193 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30193 |
|
|
30/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30193 |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|