Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3975 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17381 Week
» 70397 Month
» 189924 Year
» 3216777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E210 |
y/e |
c. 0 |
London and South Western Railway |
210 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
Southern Railway (IOW) |
W26 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
0000 |
WHITWELL |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
D4 |
To Service |
During 12/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1966 |
Service Life |
74 yrs , 5 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1891 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
71EF |
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
70G |
Newport (I.O.W.) |
8w/e |
08/02/1955 |
REINS |
70G |
Newport (I.O.W.) |
w/e |
13/06/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/05/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E210 |
|
|
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 210 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to W26 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26 |
|
|