Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3487 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16893 Week
» 69909 Month
» 189436 Year
» 3216289 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
233 |
m/e |
01/1895 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E233 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
233 |
m/e |
08/1938 |
British Railways |
30233 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
10/1924 |
BR Black |
Red and White |
09/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
R6 |
To Service |
During 01/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/02/1958 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1895 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 233 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E233 |
|
|
08/1938 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 233 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dorchester (DOR) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30233 |
|
|
31/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
02/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30233 |
|
|