Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2480 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15886 Week
» 68902 Month
» 188429 Year
» 3215282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3114 |
m/e |
02/1905 |
Great Western Railway (51xx) |
5114 |
on |
10/05/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3100/5100 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
150 |
Works Number |
2069 |
To Service |
During 02/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/09/1950 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1905 |
WOS |
|
Worcester |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/09/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
WOS |
Worcester |
m/e |
30/09/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1912 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Caerphilly Works |
On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3114 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2069 |
|
|
02/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/05/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5114 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
04/09/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5114 |
|
|