Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1096 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18899 Week
» 71915 Month
» 191442 Year
» 3218295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3130 |
m/e |
06/1905 |
Great Western Railway (51xx) |
5130 |
m/e |
06/1929 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3100/5100 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
152 |
Works Number |
2095 |
To Service |
During 06/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/08/1948 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1905 |
OXY |
|
Oxley |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
LMTN |
|
Leamington |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/08/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
LMTN |
Leamington |
m/e |
31/08/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1910 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3130 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2095 |
|
|
11/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1929 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5130 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
02/08/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5130 |
|
|