Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2868 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16274 Week
» 69290 Month
» 188817 Year
» 3215670 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3155 |
m/e |
04/1907 |
Great Western Railway (31xx) |
3103 |
m/e |
08/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
31xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
169 |
Works Number |
2243 |
To Service |
During 04/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/01/1960 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1907 |
TDU |
|
Tondu |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/01/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TDU |
Tondu |
4w/e |
25/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
NPTG |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
4w/e |
09/08/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
General |
Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' |
SLS/194805 |
02/04/1948 |
Caerphilly Works |
On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3155 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2243 |
|
|
08/1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3103 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tondu (TDU) |
|
|
14/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3103 |
|
|