Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1500 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14906 Week
» 67922 Month
» 187449 Year
» 3214302 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3163 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3150 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
169 |
Works Number |
2251 |
To Service |
During 06/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/06/1957 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 24 dys |
Total Mileage |
995,251 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3163 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2251 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
24/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3163 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stafford Road, Wolverhampton |
|
|