Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4248 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17654 Week
» 70670 Month
» 190197 Year
» 3217050 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3283 |
m/e |
02/1897 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3273 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Great Western Railway (90xx) |
9073 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Duke |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
105 |
Works Number |
1542 |
To Service |
During 02/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 08/12/1949 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1897 |
SALOP |
|
Shrewsbury |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
OXY |
|
Oxley |
4w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
OXY |
Oxley |
4w/e |
05/11/1949 |
WDN |
OXY |
Oxley |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1905 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
08/1916 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
09/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3283, name: Mounts Bay Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1542 Diagram S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1905 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3273 |
|
|
08/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
09/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9073 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
08/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9073 |
|
|