Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 202 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 202 Week
» 14459 Month
» 242343 Year
» 1463908 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C106 m/e 08/1945
BR 34006 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/11/1945 BUDE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 08/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/03/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1945
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
70E Salisbury m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 19/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 19/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 \"West Country\" Namings 21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. SLS/194605
26/03/1946 Surbiton 903 (STL) painted green was noted on the 5.37 p.m. ex Basingstoke on 26/3. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Locomotives Miscellany More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 \"West Country\" Namings 21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. SLS/194605
31/05/1948 Brighton Works Engines built in May were Nos. 34073 an 34074 'Battle of Britain' Class, without names. No. 34004 Yeovil, 34005 Barnstaple and 34006 Bude came out with L.M.S. type tenders, the tenders painted un-lined black, lettered 'British Railways' in white, and the engines in standard green livery. Other engines re-numbered in May were Nos. 32507, 32398, 30900, 32546, 32440, 32506, 32558, 32523, 32395 an 34042 Dorchester. SLS/194807
28/04/1951 Eastleigh Works Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. SLS/195106
12/05/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. SLS/195107
06/01/1960 Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. SLS/196002
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1945 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C106
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/11/1945 Naming Named 'BUDE' by Councillor J H Hallett (Chairman Bude & Stratton UDC) at Bude    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
01/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34006    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
19/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34006    

prev prev