|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 27/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 22/05/1953 | 29/05/1953 | 8 days | Non Classified | Driving axles examined for flaws |
||
Eastleigh Works | 29/01/1954 | 13/02/1954 | 16 days | Non Classified | |||
Eastleigh Works | 12/04/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 41 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 23/09/1955 | 15/10/1955 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 30/05/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 18 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 09/09/1957 | 12/10/1957 | 34 days | General | Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
Bricklayers Arms (on shed) | 03/04/1959 | 25/04/1959 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 25/04/1960 | 14/05/1960 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 07/09/1962 | 22/09/1962 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Bricklayers Arms (on shed) | 24/12/1962 | 15/02/1963 | 54 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 31/10/1963 | 28/12/1963 | 59 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 09/06/1966 | 08/07/1966 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1965 | Steam Plentiful at Clapham Junction | During 2½ hours at the 'busiest junction (combined) station in the world' then a subsequent 30 mins. or so at Waterloo on an ordinary weekday evening covering the peak period at the end of May, and as then normal-though some of the Pacifics were not exactly as rostered-I noted 10 rebuilt light Pacifics on express and main line trains : Nos. 34008/13/32/47/8/56/77/85/7/101; 34077/87 had no visible name plates when passing through. Several were on 'Merchant Navy' turns including the Bournemouth 2-hr. up service due in at 4.40, about 12 mins. late; and the heavy, fast-timed 6.30 p.m. down. Only two of the large 4-6-2s: 35026/9 were seen respectively hauling the down 'Royal Wessex' and up 'Bournemouth Belle,' loaded to 11 Pullmans plus van, about 3 mins. late, signal-checked through Clapham Junction. Most were in a rather forlorn looking state externally. Of B.R. standard classes there were: 3 class 5, 4-6-0s; a class 4 2-6-0 on down freight towards Feltham; green class 3 2-6-2T No. 82006 (lately arrived from Machynlleth, Cambrian line) on two trips with the unadvertised Kensington Post Office passenger trains; two others, also two class 4 2-6-4Ts, were on Clapham Yard-Waterloo empty stock workings. The sole Southern Railway, Maunsell, engine was S15 4-6-0MT, 30838, waiting at Waterloo in evening. | SLS/196507 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1945 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C113 Built at Brighton Works |
||
30/10/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3254 | ||
12/06/1947 | Naming | Named 'OKEHAMPTON' by W H Passmore (Mayor) at Okehampton | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
01/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY) | ||
01/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34013 | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
27/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. | ||
22/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 22/05/1953. Dep: 29/05/1953. Work undertaken: Driving axles examined for flaws |
||
29/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 29/01/1954. Dep: 13/02/1954. | ||
12/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954. | ||
23/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955. | ||
30/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. | ||
09/09/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3367 | ||
09/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
08/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
03/04/1959 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1959. Dep: 25/04/1959. | ||
25/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/04/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960. | ||
02/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
07/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/09/1962. Dep: 22/09/1962. | ||
24/12/1962 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/12/1962. Dep: 15/02/1963. | ||
16/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (70E) | ||
31/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1963. Dep: 28/12/1963. | ||
09/06/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1966. Dep: 08/07/1966. | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34013 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |