|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 14/08/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 38 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 22/05/1953 | 25/05/1953 | 4 days | Non Classified | Driving axles examined for flaws |
||
Eastleigh Works | 21/01/1954 | 18/02/1954 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 02/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 24/01/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 45 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 29/09/1958 | 25/10/1958 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 07/03/1960 | 02/04/1960 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 18/10/1961 | 09/12/1961 | 53 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/01/1949 | Brighton Works | Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. | SLS/194902 |
10/03/1960 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. | SLS/196004 |
04/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. | SLS/196112 |
26/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. | SLS/196201 |
07/09/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. | SLS/196310 |
14/09/1964 | Southern engines for storage | 34015/9/33/42/77/9, 35005/10/2/22, 73083/7, 76019 are to be stored after transfer, (In view of large scale moves to a few sheds only, the usual arrangement for such transfers has not been used this time. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1945 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C115 Built at Brighton Works |
||
19/11/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3255 | ||
31/12/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3252 | ||
26/06/1946 | Naming | Named 'EXMOUTH' by Councillor J Down (Mayor) at Exmouth | ||
31/07/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3290 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
01/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34015 | ||
07/01/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3308 | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
20/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
14/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952. | ||
22/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 22/05/1953. Dep: 25/05/1953. Work undertaken: Driving axles examined for flaws |
||
21/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/01/1954. Dep: 18/02/1954. | ||
02/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. | ||
24/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. | ||
29/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/09/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958. | ||
07/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960. | ||
18/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961. | ||
06/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (70E) | ||
16/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34015 | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |