Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 137 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4952 Week
» 11086 Month
» 238970 Year
» 1460535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C118 m/e 12/1945
BR 34018 9w/e 01/08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
25/06/1946 AXMINSTER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed12/1945
Rebuilt10/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 04/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Nov 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1945
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
70D Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 70A Nine Elms w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/06/1947 Brighton Works 21C118 Axminster was outside Brighton Works on 6/6/47, also a tender painted and lined in grey for one of the 'Pacifics' under construction. Kent and East Sussex Rly. 0-6-0T ('Terrier') No. 3 is undergoing general repairs at Brighton Works. SLS/194708
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709
30/06/1948 General Locomotives with smokebox number plates include: Nos. 30193, 30521/70, 30696, 30856/61, 30950, 32095, 34012/18. SLS/194808
18/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. SLS/196204
25/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. SLS/196204
31/05/1964 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard, Waiting Works: 73050, 73083. Works Yard, Ex Works: 34089, 73114. Erecting Shop: 30069, 32640, 32678 Undergoing restoration, 34005, 34018, 34026, 34037, 34042, 34076, 35007, 35019 35022/3, 73052, 73085/9, 76067, 76082, 80016, 80145, 80154, 15218, 15233, 20002, D3041, D3220, D3459, D3667, D6547, D6554. Scrap Yard: 30133 Intact, 34049 Remains, 82008 Intact. SLS/196407

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1945 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C118
Built at Brighton Works
   
25/06/1946 Naming Named 'AXMINSTER' by H Cawley Chairnian (Axminster UDC) at Axminster    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
01/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34018    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34018    

prev prev