|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 01/04/1953 | 30/04/1953 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 30/09/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 31 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 10/02/1956 | 17/03/1956 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 24/05/1957 | 22/06/1957 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 19/11/1958 | 20/12/1958 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 13/04/1960 | 07/05/1960 | 25 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 27/12/1961 | 10/02/1962 | 46 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1947 | Ashford Works | Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. | SLS/194706 |
30/09/1947 | General | 'West Country' Class Nos. 21C122 and 21C123 have been noted carrying their names, Exmoor and Blackmoor Vale respectively. No. 21C119 has been converted to burn oil fuel; also several 2-6-0's, at least two of which have been equipped and tested at Ashford. | SLS/194710 |
11/09/1963 | Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) | Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1946 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C123 Built at Brighton Works |
||
04/02/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3273 | ||
08/1947 | Naming | Named 'BLACKMOOR VALE' | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) | ||
01/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34023 | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) | ||
04/1950 | Naming | Renamed 'BLACKMORE VALE' | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
01/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1953. Dep: 30/04/1953. | ||
22/09/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3311 | ||
30/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. | ||
10/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956. | ||
24/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. | ||
19/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958. | ||
13/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1960. Dep: 07/05/1960. | ||
27/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1961. Dep: 10/02/1962. | ||
06/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
15/05/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
21/05/1967 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3319 | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34023 |