Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 283 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4021 Week
» 1534 Month
» 229418 Year
» 1450983 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C125 m/e 03/1946
BR 34025 4w/e 06/10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/04/1948 ROUGH TOR (removed 23/04/1948)
03/05/1948 WHIMPLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed03/1946
Rebuilt11/1957
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 03/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Oct 1957

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1946
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 08/10/1957
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 24/02/1958
73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 5w/e 11/08/1947
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 \"West Country\" Namings 21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. SLS/194605
26/03/1946 Surbiton 903 (STL) painted green was noted on the 5.37 p.m. ex Basingstoke on 26/3. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Locomotives Miscellany More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 \"West Country\" Namings 21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. SLS/194605
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
31/03/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops 49, 30352, 30416/54/99, 30501/35/89, 30580 (ex 3506), 698, 30744/51/69, 30864, 30936/56, 32094, 32347, 32608, 34025/9/54/9/61/7/96/7/8. For shops 34055, 35010. Ex shops 30766/72, 34100 (dark green), 30484 (lined black), 30571 (ex 3397), 30306. Scrap: 30122, 154, 408. Noted un-renumbered: 246, 1432. No. 769 had just been renumbered. SLS/195108
28/04/1951 Eastleigh Works Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. SLS/195106
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1946 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C125
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/04/1948 Naming Named 'ROUGH TOR'    
03/05/1948 Naming Renamed 'WHIMPLE'    
06/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34025    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34025    

prev prev