Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 312 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2651 Week
» 8785 Month
» 236669 Year
» 1458234 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3634 m/e 07/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 314
To Service During 07/1939
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 25 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1939
89B Brecon 4w/e 13/08/1955
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 10/09/1955
88J Aberdare 4w/e 28/12/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 89B Brecon 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 10/09/1955
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 31/12/1963
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3634
Built at Swindon Works
   
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Brecon (89B)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3634    

prev prev