Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 567 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 13560 Month
» 321541 Year
» 1205922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3729 m/e 07/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 07/1937
Withdrawal During 03/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 29/12/1945
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 04/12/1954
86C Hereford 4w/e 08/10/1960
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 2w/e 17/11/1962
86C Hereford 4w/e 12/01/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   4w/e 06/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 3729
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (ABEEG)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 3729    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev