Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1067 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14473 Week
» 67489 Month
» 187016 Year
» 3213869 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3774 |
on |
26/05/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
306 |
To Service |
Mon 26/05/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/05/1962 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
26/05/1938 |
NEA |
|
Neath (Court Sart) |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/05/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3774 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3774 |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|