Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 86 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3685 Week
» 9819 Month
» 237703 Year
» 1459268 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3801 on 06/12/1938

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 321
To Service Fri 06/12/1938
Withdrawal During 08/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 06/12/1938
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/10/1954
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/07/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/12/1938 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3801
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3801    

prev prev