|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 29/04/1931 | 01/08/1931 | 95 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4647 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2545 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1016327 | |
Swindon Works | 17/10/1932 | 20/12/1932 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA) |
1084797 | |
Swindon Works | 23/08/1933 | 09/1933 | Light Repair | ||||
Swindon Works | 14/04/1934 | 22/06/1934 | 70 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2422 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1165552 | |
Swindon Works | 01/07/1935 | 10/09/1935 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2417 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1234290 | |
Swindon Works | 21/03/1936 | 09/04/1936 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 16/12/1936 | 19/02/1937 | 66 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2668 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1316771 | |
Swindon Works | 28/12/1937 | 04/02/1938 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 28/02/1939 | 04/05/1939 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 6620 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2614 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1399312 | |
Swindon Works | 27/09/1939 | 25/10/1939 | 29 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2572 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 19/08/1940 | 03/10/1940 | 46 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2706 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/03/1941 | 04/05/1941 | 61 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1483043 | |
Swindon Works | 21/07/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 54 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/11/1942 | 13/01/1943 | 50 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2853 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1539830 | |
Swindon Works | 13/06/1944 | 10/08/1944 | 59 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1592298 | |
Swindon Works | 21/02/1945 | 05/04/1945 | 44 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2844 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 27/11/1945 | 09/01/1946 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 6663 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1639676 | |
Swindon Works | 21/03/1947 | 28/04/1947 | 39 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1705522 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 4646 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2750 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1758291 | |
Swindon Works | 25/03/1949 | 06/05/1949 | 43 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 10/05/1950 | 13/06/1950 | 35 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1828958 | |
Swindon Works | 09/10/1951 | 15/11/1951 | 38 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6689 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2385 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1886561 | |
Swindon Works | 23/06/1953 | 24/08/1953 | 63 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6649 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2754 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1958403 | |
Swindon Works | 21/05/1954 | 27/07/1954 | 68 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 24/11/1954 | 05/01/1955 | 43 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 10/08/1955 | 03/10/1955 | 55 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4056 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
2034693 | |
Swindon Works | 04/10/1955 | 13/10/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1945 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during November: 13, 28, 1003, 1785, 2189, 2202/39/91, 2669, 2741, 2854, 2921/34/81, 3004/44, 3183, 3366, 3435/43, 3638, 3775/98, 3802/4/13/4/7/38/57/65, 4000/16/53/74/82/95/8, 4272 4543, 4643/58, 4826, 4965/82; 5005/17/20/6, 5125/37, 5327/50/84, 5413, 5502/23, 5735/8/59/69, 5905/16/23/32/3/9/58/69, 6002/8, 6125/57, 6353/97; 6846, 6951/4, 7243, 7712/8/73/4/7/84, 8755, 9797. The advent of a K3 to Swindon works has been commented upon in the January Journal: it has a hole in its blast pipe, a bad regulator blow-through.and a hot box on one of the driving wheels. It may be recalled that B12/3 8539 was seen on the works turntable in 1944 when she was on loan to W.D. for working Ambulance Trains, but it is not known whether, on that occasion, she had entered the works or was merely using the turntable due to some defect of the one at the shed. The scale of withdrawals has been so great that the concentration yard has been overwhelmed, and some of the locos are stored in a road adjacent to the main line-2381/5, 2406, 1161, 3439, 2732/59 being noted- there on 21/12. Both latter engines had been dead at the home sheds for some time before their withdrawal. |
SLS/194602 |
31/03/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during March included: 1701, 2401, 2474, 2534, 2612, 2702, 2787, 2843, 2908, 2924, 2938, 2981, 3018, 3024, 3029, 3447, 4000, 4075, 4098, 4318, 5001, 5014, 5057, 5065, 5066, 5077, 5093, 5348, 5367, 6320, 6340, 6394, 7316, L.M.S. 8454, W.D. 77288, 78671 and 79234. (Last of the present batch of W.D. 2-8-00 to undergo repair here). Further locos. to receive T.F. boilers are: 4634, 5423, 5750, 6414 and 7428. Works' pilots during March included: 200, 201, 242, 1731, 1795, 2733, 2773 and 3561. 5705 has appeared with the G.W.R. monogram painted on the pannier tanks. New engines reported are: 1027 WES, 1028 BRD, 9402/3 PDN. Straight-sided 4,000 gallon tenders: The design as modified to suit the 'Castles' differs from the original tenders built for the '1000' Class as follows: It is 6in. narrower across the sides to match the cab width of the engine, and the running-plate is lowered to the same height as that under the engine cab. (It may not be generally realised that the '1000' Class have wider cabs and slightly higher running-plates under the cabs than what has always been standard). The coal space between the tanks is narrower so as to maintain the width of tank unchanged, and the shovel hole is also narrower. There are one or two other very minor differences, but otherwise the two types are the same. It appears that while the modified design can be used with all engine classes for which 4,000 gallon tenders are authorised, the original type will be restricted to the '1000' Class. | SLS/194705 |
30/09/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730. New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764. Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates. No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates |
SLS/194811 |
31/03/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48. No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear. |
SLS/194905 |
31/10/1951 | Swindon Works | The last of the first lot of standard Class 4MT (75009 of lot 390) was ex Swindon works this week, and construction is carrying straight on with lot 391 of the same type (75010-75019). Two more 'Castles' rebuilt from 'Stars' have gone to the concentration yard, Nos. 4016 an 4032. Nos. 4057 an 7037 (both 82C), have recently been fitted with a small rectangular brass plate, above the LH number plate only, recording the fact that on 15th November, 1950, the former was driven by H.R.H. Princess Elizabeth from the works to the station, and that the latter was named Swindon by H.R.H. on her visit to the borough on its Jubilee celebrations. Nos. 6010 (83D) and 6013 (81A) have both been fitted with new 4-row superheater boilers, and mechanical lubricators. 4000 came into works this week, minus her RH name plate, and is undergoing repair. No. 43094 has now completed tests on Swindon Test Plant and on the road between Wantage Road and Stoke Gifford. (On 4th October, 1951, she took the dynamometer car and 17 empty coaches). She is being altered to her original condition and returned to her home shed, 31D. | SLS/195112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 40 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2168 |
||
09/1906 | Naming | Named 'NORTH STAR' | ||
11/1909 | Modification | Modification: Superheated boiler fitted | ||
12/1912 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4000 | ||
21/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
21/11/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2531 | ||
16/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
29/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 29/04/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4647 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2545 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
17/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1932. Dep: 20/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA) |
||
23/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1933. Dep: ?/09/1933. | ||
14/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/04/1934. Dep: 22/06/1934. Work undertaken: Tender number 2422 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (SALOP) | ||
01/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1935. Dep: 10/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2417 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 09/04/1936. | ||
16/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/12/1936. Dep: 19/02/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2668 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
24/12/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2541 | ||
28/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1937. Dep: 04/02/1938. | ||
03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) | ||
04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) | ||
28/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1939. Dep: 04/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6620 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2614 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
27/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1939. Dep: 25/10/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2572 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1940. Dep: 03/10/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2706 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/03/1941. Dep: 04/05/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/07/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1942. Dep: 13/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2853 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1945. Dep: 05/04/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2844 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1945. Dep: 09/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6663 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/03/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2431 | ||
21/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/03/1947. Dep: 28/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2538 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
08/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4646 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2750 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1949. Dep: 06/05/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/05/1950. Dep: 13/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/10/1951. Dep: 15/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6689 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2385 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 24/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6649 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2754 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/04/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4003 | ||
21/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1954. Dep: 27/07/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/11/1954. Dep: 05/01/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
31/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
10/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/08/1955. Dep: 03/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4056 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1955. Dep: 13/10/1955. | ||
09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
25/04/1957 | To Store | To Store at Swindon (82C) | ||
20/05/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4000 from Landore (87E) | ||
13/07/1957 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |