Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4037   30/12/1910

Names Carried
Date From Name
30/12/1910 QUEEN PHILIPPA
14/04/1937 THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class Star
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Star30/12/1910
Castle02/07/1926
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 180
Works Number 2386
To Service Mon 30/12/1910 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal Mon 17/09/1962 off Exeter (83C)
Scrapping Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 51 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 1775 29/06/1926 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g Intermediate 2376 12/1926 GWR 3,500g
Churchward 3,500g 1860 06/1928 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1835 14/01/1930 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2539 20/05/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1852 09/1930 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2584 19/08/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2585 23/02/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2435 03/05/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2439 21/09/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 28/10/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2431 13/11/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2604 03/03/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2623 02/09/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2433 30/11/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2797 28/11/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2548 08/07/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2443 26/07/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2700 03/02/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2403 11/10/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2747 16/07/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2627 27/02/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2544 04/10/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2546 28/02/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2700 04/07/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2566 22/06/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2547 30/01/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4099 01/03/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2722 10/09/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2573 08/10/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2648 05/11/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2812 24/02/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2733 22/04/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4125 12/08/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Notes
Notes With 2,429,722 miles under it's belt by the time of withdrawal, 4037 was the most travelled of all GWR engines.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) 30/12/1910
SDN Swindon 07/06/1913
LA Laira 17/06/1913
EXE Exeter m/e 12/1913
PDN Old Oak Common 16/08/1915
OXF Oxford 01/07/1919
PDN Old Oak Common 25/07/1919
OXF Oxford m/e 12/1919
PDN Old Oak Common 06/10/1920
SRD Stafford Road 02/07/1926
PDN Old Oak Common 27/08/1926
SRD Stafford Road 12/11/1926
TYS Tyseley 27/07/1929
SRD Stafford Road 09/08/1929
PDN Old Oak Common 27/01/1930
CARM Carmarthen m/e 03/1933
SDN Swindon 28/11/1933
CARM Carmarthen 19/12/1933
PDN Old Oak Common 18/05/1934
83G Penzance 16/06/1956
83A Newton Abbot 28/09/1956
87E Landore 23/02/1957
83A Newton Abbot m/e 06/1957
83C Exeter 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn 17/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/06/1926 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4602)
09/06/1928 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4660)
14/01/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4612)
25/10/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4608)
28/10/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4653)
02/06/1938 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4656)
08/07/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4657)
03/02/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4646)
11/10/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6644)
04/10/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6601)
04/07/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6683)
01/03/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6615)
22/04/1958 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4650)
12/08/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6684)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 01/06/1912 19/07/1912 49 days General  
Swindon Works 15/10/1912 04/11/1912 21 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 02/02/1914 10/03/1914 37 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 29/04/1915 16/08/1915 110 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 27/01/1917 29/06/1917 154 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 06/03/1920 06/10/1920 215 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 29/04/1922 13/09/1922 138 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 08/05/1924 09/08/1924 94 days Heavy  
Swindon Works 24/02/1926 02/07/1926 129 days Rebuilding
Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1775 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/11/1926 12/11/1926 3 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 07/12/1926 20/12/1926 14 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 14/03/1928 12/06/1928 91 days Heavy
Boiler number 4660 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1860 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
868450
Swindon Works 12/11/1929 27/01/1930 77 days Heavy
Boiler number 4612 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1835 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
958709
Swindon Works 30/04/1930 03/11/1930 188 days Light Repair
Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1852 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
1035149
Swindon Works 02/06/1931 31/08/1931 91 days General
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/12/1932 03/1933   Intermediate
Tender number 2585 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1105022
Swindon Works 07/07/1933 07/1933   Light Repair  
Swindon Works 03/10/1933 10/1933   Light Repair  
Swindon Works 06/03/1934 18/05/1934 74 days Intermediate
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1164699
Swindon Works 10/09/1935 23/11/1935 75 days General
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1246889
Swindon Works 20/07/1936 02/08/1936 14 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 08/09/1936 27/09/1936 20 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/01/1937 12/03/1937 59 days Intermediate
Tender number 2604 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1327896
Swindon Works 06/09/1937 10/10/1937 35 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 15/03/1938 08/06/1938 86 days General
Boiler number 4656 (Diagram HA)
1391070
Swindon Works 13/10/1939 09/12/1939 58 days Intermediate
Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1467022
Swindon Works 30/09/1941 30/11/1941 62 days Intermediate
Tender number 2797 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1548170
Swindon Works 27/05/1943 23/07/1943 58 days General
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2548 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1618757
Swindon Works 08/06/1945 26/07/1945 49 days Intermediate
Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1688609
Swindon Works 31/12/1946 03/02/1947 35 days General
Boiler number 4646 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1753158
Swindon Works 26/08/1948 11/10/1948 47 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6644 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1832374
Swindon Works 03/06/1949 15/07/1949 43 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 24/01/1950 27/02/1950 35 days Light Casual
Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/08/1950 04/10/1950 42 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1921954
Swindon Works 02/02/1951 28/02/1951 27 days Light Casual
Tender number 2546 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 26/05/1952 04/07/1952 40 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
2006524
Swindon Works 05/05/1953 22/06/1953 49 days Light Casual
Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/01/1954 01/03/1954 39 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
2085818
Swindon Works 03/01/1956 24/02/1956 53 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2812 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
2173547
Swindon Works 01/02/1958 22/04/1958 81 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2733 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
2264985
Swindon Works 21/05/1960 12/08/1960 84 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6684 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4125 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
2368536

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/12/1910 To Service To service as GWR Number 4037, name: QUEEN PHILIPPA
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2386
Allocated to Laira (LA)
   
01/06/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1912. Dep: 19/07/1912.    
15/10/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1912. Dep: 04/11/1912.    
07/06/1913 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
17/06/1913 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
12/1913 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
02/02/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1914. Dep: 10/03/1914.    
29/04/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/04/1915. Dep: 16/08/1915.    
16/08/1915 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
27/01/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/01/1917. Dep: 29/06/1917.    
01/07/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (OXF)    
25/07/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
12/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (OXF)    
06/03/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/03/1920. Dep: 06/10/1920.    
06/10/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
29/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/04/1922. Dep: 13/09/1922.    
08/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/05/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924.    
24/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 24/02/1926. Dep: 02/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1775 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
02/07/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
27/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
10/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1926. Dep: 12/11/1926.    
12/11/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
12/1926 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g Intermediate number 2376    
07/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1926. Dep: 20/12/1926.    
14/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/03/1928. Dep: 12/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4660 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1860 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
27/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS)    
09/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
12/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/11/1929. Dep: 27/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4612 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1835 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
27/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
30/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/04/1930. Dep: 03/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1852 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
02/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1931. Dep: 31/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: ?/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2585 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM)    
07/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1933. Dep: ?/07/1933.    
03/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1933. Dep: ?/10/1933.    
28/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
19/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM)    
06/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/03/1934. Dep: 18/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
10/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1935. Dep: 23/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1936. Dep: 02/08/1936.    
08/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1936. Dep: 27/09/1936.    
13/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/01/1937. Dep: 12/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2604 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/04/1937 Naming Renamed 'THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS'    
06/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1937. Dep: 10/10/1937.    
15/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1938. Dep: 08/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4656 (Diagram HA)
   
02/09/1938 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2623    
13/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1941. Dep: 30/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2797 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1943. Dep: 23/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2548 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/06/1945. Dep: 26/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1946. Dep: 03/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4646 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/08/1948. Dep: 11/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6644 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/06/1949. Dep: 15/07/1949.    
16/07/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2747    
24/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1950. Dep: 27/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/08/1950. Dep: 04/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1951. Dep: 28/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2546 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/05/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 22/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/01/1954. Dep: 01/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/09/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2722    
08/10/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2573    
05/11/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2648    
03/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/01/1956. Dep: 24/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2812 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
28/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/02/1958. Dep: 22/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2733 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/05/1960. Dep: 12/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6684 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4125 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
17/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4037 from Exeter (83C)    

prev prev