Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2611 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1411 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
British Railways |
58080 |
|
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3898 |
To Service |
During 06/1900 to Skipton (30) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 28/01/1956 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
25/04/1926 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
14/07/1945 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2611 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3898 Allocated to Skipton (30) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
06/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1411 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
25/04/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (30) |
|
|
14/07/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58080 |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58080 |
|
|