Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1646 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15052 Week
» 68068 Month
» 187595 Year
» 3214448 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2624 |
m/e |
08/1900 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1424 |
m/e |
10/1907 |
British Railways |
58087 |
|
05/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3911 |
To Service |
During 08/1900 to Swansea (Upper Bank) (6) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 16/07/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1909 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
07/1918 |
LMS 'C1' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2624 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3911 Allocated to Swansea (Upper Bank) (6) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6) |
|
|
10/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1424 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6) |
|
|
11/1909 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6) |
|
|
07/1918 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C1' boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6) |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (9) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (9) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Burton (17B) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58087 |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58087 |
|
|