28/02/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. |
SLS/194605 |
24/03/1946 |
Stock Returns |
No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. |
SLS/194605 |
30/11/1947 |
Swindon Works |
Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. |
SLS/194801 |
31/07/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work July: Nos. 1501 (1/7), 1502 (27/7). Both are unlined black. Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos. 1005/12/25, 1467/68, 2206, 2856/86, 2920, 3663, 3779, 3853, 4013/41/56/61, 4133, 4381, 4631, 4901/43, 5050/69, 5238, 5369, 5552/59, 5918, 6003, 6103/08/22, 6320 (for re-conversion), 6336/45/54, 6417, 6804/38, 6910, 7307, 7809, 7905, 8762. Condemned: 2708 an 9087. No. 3837 (ex 4854) has been re-converted to coal-burning. No. 6020 has been painted blue, while No. 4961 has been Painted black and fully lined. The first of the contractor built series of 94XX arrived on Works on 27/7 viz: Nos. 8400 an 8401; they have entered shops to have the A.T.C. gear fitted. Works' Nos. checked are: Bagnall 2910/11 of 1949. Awaiting Works at the east end of the yard- were Nos. 1000, 2708, 2875, 3635, 4981, 5057, 5554/57, 6844; No. 2863 (ex 4805-oil-burning) was also in evidence. B shop contained Nos. 1363, 1467/68, 2206/11, 2572, 3663/77, 4631, 6408/09/17, 7735, 9638. New engines from Bagnall's were Nos. 8400/1 (makers Nos. 2910/1) and Swindon construction included Nos. 7026 (painted), 7027, 1504 (painted), 1505 and the frames of a diesel (Lot 363). Barry 0-6-2T's Nos. 212, 213 an 246 were acting as Works' shunters. |
SLS/194909 |
31/01/1958 |
Locomotive Statement |
4056 was the last ' Star' in service: 30738 remains the sole survivor of the 30736-55. series: 32331 was the last of the rebuilt 'Remembrance' N15IX class. Renewed scrapping of the GW. 90XX class has taken place: the NE. D20 class is now extinct: the, wholesale withdrawal of the D49 class appears to have begun. The V4 class is now extinct. Three G.E. ' Intermediates' (62785/8/97) are all that remain of this wheel-type. 52510 was the last Furness locomotive: 30688 was the first of its class to be scrapped, following an accident at Staines. The A7 class is now extinct: the first two A8 have been withdrawn. 47994 is the sole Garratt survivor. The GW. 31XX class is now reduced to five. All the remaining Rhymney and Taff. Vale engines have now gone: the LBSC E6 class is no longer intact: the first two NB N15 have been withdrawn: 30757 was the last representative of the PD & SWJR. Withdrawals of the GW 67XX, 77XX and 87XX have begun; the 54XX are rapidly disappearing: only two N.L. engines (58850/7) remain. The M.R. representatives now number four only. 30588 was the last of its class: 68126 was the last GE Y4 in capital stock. D-E. Standard shunters continue to be built very rapidly, Crewe and Doncaster having joined Derby and Darlington in their production. Further new classes of main line locomotives have appeared and several more are due for delivery early in 1958. D-M. Swindon has now joined the various contractors in turning out the standard small shunting type. These locos. will in future (with the exception of d11176) bear numbers in the D.2XXX series. |
SLS/195803 |