Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3332 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16738 Week
» 69754 Month
» 189281 Year
» 3216134 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4057 |
m/e |
07/1914 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
Star |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
199 |
Works Number |
2583 |
To Service |
During 07/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 07/02/1952 off Swindon (82C) |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1914 |
SDN |
|
Swindon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/02/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SDN |
Swindon |
4w/e |
28/12/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
29/02/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1930 |
'Castle' pattern outside steam pipes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/11/1950 |
H.R.H. Princess Elizabeth visits Swindo |
On the occasion of the visit of H.R.H. Princess Elizabeth to Swindon Borough and Works on 15th November, the ordinary-cum-Royal trains (9.15 a.m. first part from Paddington-5.20 p.m. from Swindon), making usual stops, and with loads of over 350 tons, were hauled in each direction by No. 4057 Princess Elizabeth, beautifully turned out, and in each case gaining a little time. |
SLS/195102 |
31/10/1951 |
Swindon Works |
The last of the first lot of standard Class 4MT (75009 of lot 390) was ex Swindon works this week, and construction is carrying straight on with lot 391 of the same type (75010-75019). Two more 'Castles' rebuilt from 'Stars' have gone to the concentration yard, Nos. 4016 an 4032. Nos. 4057 an 7037 (both 82C), have recently been fitted with a small rectangular brass plate, above the LH number plate only, recording the fact that on 15th November, 1950, the former was driven by H.R.H. Princess Elizabeth from the works to the station, and that the latter was named Swindon by H.R.H. on her visit to the borough on its Jubilee celebrations. Nos. 6010 (83D) and 6013 (81A) have both been fitted with new 4-row superheater boilers, and mechanical lubricators. 4000 came into works this week, minus her RH name plate, and is undergoing repair. No. 43094 has now completed tests on Swindon Test Plant and on the road between Wantage Road and Stoke Gifford. (On 4th October, 1951, she took the dynamometer car and 17 empty coaches). She is being altered to her original condition and returned to her home shed, 31D. |
SLS/195112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4057, name: PRINCESS ELIZABETH Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2583 |
|
|
04/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: 'Castle' pattern outside steam pipes fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
07/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4057 from Swindon (82C) |
|
|