Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1031 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 6139 Week
» 35637 Month
» 372483 Year
» 1594048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1268 m/e 07/1892
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8318 m/e 10/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28318 m/e 09/1940
British Railways 58362 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3280
To Service During 07/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/03/1953
Service Life 60 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1892
7D Rhyl 4w/e 24/03/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 21/03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12D Workington w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 03/03/1951
WDN   w/e 21/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1268
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3280
   
10/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8318    
09/1940 Renumbered Renumbered to 28318    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58362    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
21/03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 58362    

prev prev