Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 691 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3279 Week
» 32777 Month
» 369623 Year
» 1591188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 320 m/e 02/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8430 m/e 11/1926
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28430 m/e 02/1943
British Railways 58378 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3641
To Service During 02/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/06/1953
Service Life 56 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1897
10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 04/11/1950
8D Widnes 4w/e 21/02/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 27/06/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 14/10/1950
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   w/e 27/06/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1897 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 320
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3641
   
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 8430    
02/1943 Renumbered Renumbered to 28430    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58378    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
27/06/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 58378    

prev prev