Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 135 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5252 Week
» 25694 Month
» 362540 Year
» 1584105 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1476 m/e 03/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8450 m/e 09/1928
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28450 m/e 06/1942
British Railways 58381 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3711
To Service During 03/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/06/1952
Service Life 54 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1898
   Withdrawn w/e 21/06/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/09/1947
LOAN 7B Bangor w/e 11/03/1950
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 25/03/1950
WDN   w/e 21/06/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Market Harborough Station Recent unusual visitors have included L.N.E.R. 'B16/3' 1421 YK on 24/6 and 'K3' 1899 on 8/7, both at the head of specials carrying European Volunteer Workers. Although the line from Nottingham via Melton Mowbray is G.N. and L.N.W. Joint, the L.M.S. normally works all traffic South of John O'Gaunt. The locomotives were turned on the L.N.W. turntable and returned North with the empty stock. On 8/7 the 8.3 a.m. arrival from Rugby was worked by L.M.S. 28450 . This local passenger working is more usually in the hands of one of the Harborough 4F's or L.N.W. 0-8-0's. With the departure of 6601 , the 6.25 a.m. to Rugby and the 5.40 p.m. ex Rugby are now worked by a variety of locomotives ranging from 2-6-2T to Stanier Class 5's. The latter train now runs, unadvertised, to East Norton for the benefit of local factory workers, returning as empty stock. SLS/194709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1898 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1476
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3711
   
09/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8450    
06/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 28450    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58381    
21/06/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 58381    

prev prev