Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 16 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2604 Week
» 32102 Month
» 368948 Year
» 1590513 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1491 m/e 03/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8451 m/e 02/1928
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28451 m/e 06/1942
British Railways 58382 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3712
To Service During 03/1898
Withdrawal During 01/1954
Service Life 55 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1898
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) w/e 17/07/1948
LOAN 5D Stoke w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 11/09/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1898 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1491
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3712
   
02/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8451    
06/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 28451    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58382    
01/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58382    

prev prev