Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1033 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 6141 Week
» 35639 Month
» 372485 Year
» 1594050 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 22 m/e 12/1899
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8509 m/e 04/1928
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28509 m/e 10/1943
British Railways 58394 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 3992
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/08/1955
Service Life 55 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1899
8D Widnes 4w/e 21/03/1953
6H Bangor 8w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 06/08/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 10/07/1954
WDN   w/e 06/08/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/07/1950 Derby Works Observations (22/6) U.T.A. 54 ready for despatch, 55 completed, 56 and 57 under construction. (29/6) 56 completed. (6/7) 57 almost finished. New 2-6-4T 42145 in paint shop (22/6): 42146 almost ready (6/7). Diesel-electric shunters 12069/70 complete on 22/6, 12071 to follow. Being cut up (22/6) 727, 41039, 3173: already cut up 58041, 58082. In store near station 404, 40411, 40416, 43364 (22/6 to 6/7). Repainted with emblem: 43861, 44313, 58127, 12035, 44050, 47282, 44338, 43310, 47207, 44132, 44558, 47672, 44179, 58293, 43356; also with lining 42348, 42350, 40053, 40694, 41063, 42399, 40931, 41064. Off works: 40631 (plain tender); lettered L.M.S., 43490, 43575, 44559, 41079, 41100, 42341, 43203, 43267, 44241, 44559, 58070, 44174, 40060, 40063, 41016, 43399, 58189 (tender cab). Lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS: 44030, 40055, 41074 (tall chimney); also with lining 42304, 40055. In works yard (22/6-6/7): 40556, 58036, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 22853. 10800 was on trial, on 22/6 with dynamometer car and six bogies, and a week later on test run with dynamometer car and five bogies-Derby-Leicester-Manchester-Derby. The first set of frames for No. 1 of Order 4310 (? 2-6-0) were set up early' in July.
46100 is now 'Taper Scot' green livery, with smoke deflectors, number on smokebox door, no bell, and the large nameplates which were put on the old engine after her return from U.S.A. (These are not correct for the engine as it is now). 46210 is the first of its class to be painted blue, and is in traffic. 58394 (ex 28509) has come off works and so escaped the melting-pot for a time.
SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 22
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3992
   
04/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8509    
10/1943 Renumbered Renumbered to 28509    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58394    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
06/08/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 58394    

prev prev