Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 711 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1960 Week
» 22402 Month
» 359248 Year
» 1580813 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 38 m/e 02/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8512 m/e 04/1926
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28512 m/e 06/1942
British Railways 58396 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4005
To Service During 02/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/08/1953
Service Life 53 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1900
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 29/12/1951
8D Widnes 4w/e 12/07/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 29/08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 12D Workington w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   w/e 29/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1900 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 38
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4005
   
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 8512    
06/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 28512    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58396    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
29/08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 58396    

prev prev