Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 127 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 127 Week
» 29625 Month
» 366471 Year
» 1588036 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 121 m/e 03/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8525 m/e 11/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28525 m/e 11/1943
British Railways 58400 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4019
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/09/1951
Service Life 51 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1900
12D Workington 4w/e 22/06/1946
8D Widnes 4w/e 19/05/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 29/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12D Workington w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 21/04/1951
WDN   w/e 29/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 121
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4019
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8525    
11/1943 Renumbered Renumbered to 28525    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58400    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
29/09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 58400    

prev prev