Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 605 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3193 Week
» 32691 Month
» 369537 Year
» 1591102 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 190 m/e 05/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8531 m/e 01/1928
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28531 m/e 11/1943
British Railways 58404 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4036
To Service During 05/1900
Withdrawal During 01/1950
Service Life 49 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1900
5B Crewe South 3w/e 11/12/1948
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2E Warwick w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 20/11/1948
WDN   w/e 21/01/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1900 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 190
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4036
   
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8531    
11/1943 Renumbered Renumbered to 28531    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 58404 but not taken up    
01/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 28531    

prev prev