Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 409 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4221 Week
» 33719 Month
» 370565 Year
» 1592130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 541 m/e 02/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8583 m/e 11/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28583 m/e 05/1944
British Railways 58419 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4119
To Service During 02/1901
Withdrawal During 02/1953
Service Life 52 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1901
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 4A Shrewsbury w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 13/10/1951
WDN   w/e 14/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 541
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4119
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8583    
05/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 28583    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 58419 but not taken up    
02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 28583    

prev prev