Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 94 Today
» 1279 Yesterday
» 7763 Week
» 94 Month
» 374107 Year
» 1595672 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 547 m/e 02/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8585 m/e 11/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28585 m/e 11/1942
British Railways 58420 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4121
To Service During 02/1901
Withdrawal During 11/1951
Service Life 50 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1901
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 5w/e 16/07/1949
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 01/10/1949
WDN   w/e 24/11/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 547
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4121
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8585    
11/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 28585    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 58420 but not taken up    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
11/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 28585    

prev prev