Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1086 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 6194 Week
» 35692 Month
» 372538 Year
» 1594103 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 559 m/e 03/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8592 m/e 12/1926
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28592 m/e 05/1944
British Railways 58422 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4109
To Service During 03/1901
Withdrawal During 03/1950
Service Life 48 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1901
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 20/09/1947
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/12/1947
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 11/02/1950
WDN   w/e 18/03/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1901 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 559
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4109
   
12/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 8592    
05/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 28592    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 58422 but not taken up    
03/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 28592    

prev prev