Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 129 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5246 Week
» 25688 Month
» 362534 Year
» 1584099 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 684 m/e 05/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8619 m/e 10/1927
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28619 m/e 05/1945
British Railways 58429 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4218
To Service During 05/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/02/1953
Service Life 50 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1902
3B Bushbury 3w/e 11/12/1948
5B Crewe South 4w/e 31/12/1950
3D Aston 4w/e 04/10/1952
5B Crewe South 3w/e 24/01/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 21/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 12D Workington w/e 09/04/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 5B Crewe South m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 3D Aston 4w/e 04/10/1952
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South 4w/e 24/01/1953
WDN   w/e 21/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 684
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4218
   
10/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 8619    
05/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 28619    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58429    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
21/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 58429    

prev prev