Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1241 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 6358 Week
» 26800 Month
» 363646 Year
» 1585211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2070 m/e 05/1902
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) 8622 m/e 11/1926
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) 28622 m/e 05/1943
British Railways 58430 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Cauliflowers
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 4223
To Service During 05/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/03/1955
Service Life 52 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1902
   Withdrawn w/e 12/03/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12D Workington w/e 17/04/1948
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   w/e 12/03/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1945 Swansea Paxton Street MPD Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. SLS/194601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1902 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2070
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4223
   
11/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 8622    
05/1943 Renumbered Renumbered to 28622    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58430    
12/03/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 58430    

prev prev