Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 88 Today
» 1279 Yesterday
» 7757 Week
» 88 Month
» 374101 Year
» 1595666 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2163   12/1874
London and North Western Railway (Dup) 3490   11/1917
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 8107   01/1928
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup) 28107   11/1938
British Railways 58327   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Engines
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 1865
To Service During 12/1874
Withdrawal During 06/1952
Service Life 77 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1874
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 11/12/1948
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury w/e 03/06/1950
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 14/06/1952
WDN   w/e 14/06/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1874 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2163
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 1865
   
11/1917 Renumbered Renumbered to 3490    
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8107    
11/1938 Renumbered Renumbered to 28107    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 58327 but not taken up    
06/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 28107    

prev prev