Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 202 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 5319 Week
» 25761 Month
» 362607 Year
» 1584172 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2207   09/1875
London and North Western Railway (Dup) 3491   11/1917
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 8128   08/1926
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup) 28128   07/1940
British Railways 58330   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Engines
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 1976
To Service During 09/1875
Withdrawal During 02/1953
Service Life 77 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1875
11B Barrow in Furness 8w/e 14/06/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 14/06/1952
WDN   w/e 28/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1875 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2207
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 1976
   
11/1917 Renumbered Renumbered to 3491    
08/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 8128    
07/1940 Renumbered Renumbered to 28128    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 58330 but not taken up    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 28128    

prev prev