Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 781 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2030 Week
» 22472 Month
» 359318 Year
» 1580883 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 714   01/1881
London and North Western Railway (Dup) 3417   12/1916
War Dept. 2698   1917
London and North Western Railway (Ex-ROD) 2375   06/1919
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 8216   08/1928
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup) 28216   08/1940
British Railways 58341   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Engines
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 2426
To Service During 01/1881
Withdrawal During 04/1950
Service Life 69 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1881
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 26/03/1949
WDN   w/e 22/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1881 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 714
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2426
   
12/1916 Renumbered Renumbered to 3417    
1917 Renumbered Renumbered to 2698    
06/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2375    
08/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 8216    
08/1940 Renumbered Renumbered to 28216    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 58341 but not taken up    
04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 28216    

prev prev