Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3778 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17184 Week
» 70200 Month
» 189727 Year
» 3216580 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
859 |
|
05/1885 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11504 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51504 |
|
06/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
Works Number |
2816 |
To Service |
During 05/1885 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/08/1956 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1885 |
26D |
|
Bury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26F |
|
Belle Vue |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
39A |
|
Gorton |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/08/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1885 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 859 Built at Kitson, Works Number 2816 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11504 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51504 |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (26F) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
24/08/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51504 |
|
|