Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3584 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16990 Week
» 70006 Month
» 189533 Year
» 3216386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Highland Railway |
136 |
m/e |
02/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17695 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57695 |
on |
25/01/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Drummond |
Class |
K |
Company History |
HR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3844 |
To Service |
During 02/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 25/01/1952 off Hurlford (67B) |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32C |
Forres |
4w/e |
27/04/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/01/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/05/1947 |
Corkerhill MPD |
Six of the ex H. Rly. 'Barneys,' viz., Nos. 17694, 17695, 17697, 17698, 17699 and 17702, were seen on shed here on 25/5. Nos. 17695 and 17699 still have the safety valves on the dome, while No. 17697 has a stovepipe chimney. |
SLS/194708 |
26/01/1952 |
Highland Section |
Now that No. 57695, the last of Drummond Goods, has been withdrawn, the surviving Highland engines total seven only, of three classes (2 'Bens,' 2 'Strathpeffers,' 3 'Clan Goods'). The Drummond 0-6-0 tender engines were colloquially known as 'Barneys' and were built in three batches, six in 1900, four in 1902 and two in 1907. They had 5 ft. 0 in. driving wheels, 18½ in. x 26 in. cylinders. The first six were provided with eight-wheeled tenders when new, but the idea was to use these on some of the 4-4-0 'Bens' and Lochs'-hence an exchange was effected, and the goods engines ran with six-wheeled tenders, as did the later engines of the class. The next four engines had Drummond water-tube fireboxes. The boiler was pitched with its centre-line 7 ft. 3 in. above rail-level: heating surface (without water-tubes) 1,175 sq. ft. : grate area 20.3 sq. ft. Working pressure 160 lb. Coupled wheelbase 16 ft. 6 in. List of Class: No. | Makers and Date | Renumbered | Withdrawn | 18 | Dubs 4240/02 | L.M.S. 17699 | 2/49 | 19 | Dubs 4241/02 | L.M.S. 17700 | 12/46 | 20 | Dubs 4242/02 | L.M.S. 17701 | 2/36 | 21 | Dubs 4243/02 | L.M.S. 17702 | 10/49 | 36 | N.B.L. 17896/07 | L.M.S. 17703 | 6/47 | 55 | N.B.L. 17897/07 | 37, L.M.S. 17704 | 12/46 | 134 | Dubs 3842/00 | L.M.S. 17693 | 6/49 | 135 | Dubs 3843/00 | L.M.S. 17694 | 2/50 | 136 | Dubs 3844/00 | L.M.S. 17695, B.R. 57695 (5/48) | 1/52 | 137 | Dubs 3845/00 | L.M.S. 17696 | 3/46 | 138 | Dubs 3846/00 | L.M.S. 17697, B.R. 57697 (10/48) | 2/51 | 139 | Dubs 3847/00 | L.M.S. 17698, B.R. 57698 (11/48) | 12/51 | Thus, though No. 20 was withdrawn when only 33½ years old, No. 136 had seen almost 52 years' service when withdrawn. |
SLS/195204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Highland Railway Number 136 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3844 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17695 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A) |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
25/01/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57695 from Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
25/01/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57695 |
|
|