|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | West Cumberland | Moor Row: The following locomotives comprised the shed strength at Easter:-ex Furness 0-6-0's Nos. 12494/99, 12501/10; ex L. & Y. 0-6-0's Nos. 12098, 12110/84, 12201/85, 12418/53; '3F' 0-6-OT's Nos. 7337/90, 7525 and 'Cauliflower' No. 28544. The latter is the spare engine and only used when no other locomotive is available. The coaling stage is now being reconstructed. The standard Class '4' 0-6-0's at Workington have now been taken off the Workington-Carnforth and Barrow through goods workings and replaced by the new '4F' 2-6-0's. The through workings to West Cumberland by 'Patriot's' from Preston (10B) have now been supplemented by numerous Class '5' and 'Jubilee' 4-6-0's from Crewe (5A). The local passenger turns in the area are still in the hands of Fowler and Stanier 2-6-4T's from Carnforth and Barrow sheds. Ex L.N.W. 0-8-0's appear fairly regularly on extra through goods turns from Carnforth (11A) to Workington. A certain amount of carriage cleaning and superficial painting is being undertaken at the former Furness shed at Whitehaven (Corkickle). The reconstruction of Bransty tunnel (now in the twenty-sixth year) proceeds at the customary rate and the Railway Executive has now submitted a scheme to the Whitehaven Corporation for the reconstruction of the Bransty end of the tunnel, which passes under the main road leading northwards out of the town. | SLS/194905 |
07/04/1950 | West Cumberland | Moor Row: This shed presented an interesting picture on 7/4 when the entire stud of 12E was on view. Three locomotives are on loan at present and consist of two Class '2P' 4-4-0's-No. 656 of 12D and No. 403 of 12A-and No. 4390 also of Upperby shed. No. 403 was due for shopping at Derby immediately after the Easter holiday. The ex-L. & Y. 'regulars' are still as follows: Nos. 12110, 12201 an 12285. Contrary to reports, No. 12418 has not been withdrawn, but has been overhauled at Horwich and was due back after Easter. Ex-Furness No. 12494 has also been reprieved at Horwich and will run for another two years, on her return to Moor Row. The other two ex-Furness locomotives-Nos. 12499 an 12510-were both on the shed. Standard Class '3F' 0-6-0 tanks, three in number, were Nos. 47337, 7390 an 47604. The latter is a newcomer to 12E. No. 47525 was due back from shopping after Easter. | SLS/195005 |
11/08/1956 | West Cumberland Visit | SLS members gathered by devious routes in the Citadel station at Carlisle, the writer travelling G. & S.W. from Glasgow 'spotting' ex G.E. 2-4-2T No. 67157 awaiting scrapping at Kilmarnock works with several compound 4-4-0's and K2 2-6-0's. While at Dumfries the last of the McIntosh 19' Class 0-4-4T's (No. 55124) was seen, the London Midland Region striving to cope with large holiday crowds. Matters were not improved by the 'Royal Scot' being halted for a quarter of an hour at platform 3 for its Pacific, 46224, to be replaced by 46252. Our connection, the Perth-London, departed 21½ minutes late at 1-16½ behind 46242 and on arrival at Penrith it was found that temporary alterations had been made in the service on the C.K. & P.-the 1-30 p.m. to Workington followed the through train from Manchester to Keswick. This comprised Class 2MT 2-6-0's Nos. 46456/7, coupled tender to tender, with eight corridors. Traversing Lakeland in brilliant sunshine, after early rain, we descended at tree-shaded Keswick and continued by the retimed 1-30 which was worked by 46491. At Workington (Main), reached at 3-49, a visit was paid to the shed where the centre of attraction was ex-Furness 0-6-0 No. 52499 (with L. & Y. boiler). Another of these locos., 52510, was seen on a freight. The plan to return immediately to Carlisle to do Silloth had now to be abandoned, in any case on Saturdays this branch is taken over from the diesels by J39's and instead we carried on along the coast to Whitehaven by the 4-28 (3.25 ex-Carlisle) which was another steam train-2-6-4T No. 42544 with four packed coaches. At Whitehaven (Bransty) cameras were focussed on un-rebuilt Patriot No. 45542 which came in with a train from the south. Earlier, Stanier 2-6-0 No. 42962 had been seen on one of these, before rejoining the train which now formed the 5-15 to Carlisle. However, some diehards waited for the 6-15 departure and at last ran a diesel set to earth. After traversing the erstwhile Maryport and Carlisle line, the Citadel station was reached 2 minutes late at 6-40 p.m. when a final spot of excitement was provided by our using the same platform as the empty stock of the Royal Train which, that morning, had arrived at Appleby with the Queen and Duke of Edinburgh. It departed northwards in charge of Class SMT 4-6-0's Nos. 44676 an 45455. | SLS/195610 |
31/03/1957 | Whitehaven | The two additional sidings and shunting neck are now in use at Corkickle. On 28/3 the sidings behind the old Corkickle Furness shed were packed to capacity with sets of coaches for some of the 7 'specials' laid on for the Rugby League Cup Semi-Final between Whitehaven and Leeds at Odsal, Bradford, on 30th March. An eighth train was being held 'in reserve.' It is understood that Upperby Shed was providing motive power. Ex-F.R. 0-6-0 52510 was noted on a short local goods at Siddick Junction on 27th March. The daily Workington-Siddick-Moor Row-Workington freight is now a ' standard Class 4 ' job. Coal trips on the Gilgarron Branch (to No. 10 Pit Sidings) are also 'standard class 4' worked. Traffic off the Monkwray Incline at Corkickle has increased with large numbers of Acid tanks coming out of Solway Chemicals and a steady stream of 'covhops' coming in from Winnington. The anhydride rock to Prudhoe still provides a daily trip from Corkickle. It is reported from a reliable source that the Down 'second mail' (5-40 a.m. from Carnforth) was recently headed by 70054 'Dornoch Firth.' A considerable number of elderly M. & C. Section 'narrow stock' is stored in the sidings at Bullgill, near Maryport. On 29th March the 4-50 p.m. parcels from Whitehaven arrived in Carlisle behind 'Patriot' (45500) herself. A rare sight was witnessed at Harrington on 27th March. This was a 'Type 0-6-0ST J94' of the United Steel Companies panting slowly up to Rosehill on the Lowca Light Railway, hauling four empty wagons tailed by an ex-L.N.W. 10-ton goods brake van lettered 'U.S.C.' |
SLS/195705 |
31/01/1958 | Locomotive Statement | 4056 was the last ' Star' in service: 30738 remains the sole survivor of the 30736-55. series: 32331 was the last of the rebuilt 'Remembrance' N15IX class. Renewed scrapping of the GW. 90XX class has taken place: the NE. D20 class is now extinct: the, wholesale withdrawal of the D49 class appears to have begun. The V4 class is now extinct. Three G.E. ' Intermediates' (62785/8/97) are all that remain of this wheel-type. 52510 was the last Furness locomotive: 30688 was the first of its class to be scrapped, following an accident at Staines. The A7 class is now extinct: the first two A8 have been withdrawn. 47994 is the sole Garratt survivor. The GW. 31XX class is now reduced to five. All the remaining Rhymney and Taff. Vale engines have now gone: the LBSC E6 class is no longer intact: the first two NB N15 have been withdrawn: 30757 was the last representative of the PD & SWJR. Withdrawals of the GW 67XX, 77XX and 87XX have begun; the 54XX are rapidly disappearing: only two N.L. engines (58850/7) remain. The M.R. representatives now number four only. 30588 was the last of its class: 68126 was the last GE Y4 in capital stock. D-E. Standard shunters continue to be built very rapidly, Crewe and Doncaster having joined Derby and Darlington in their production. Further new classes of main line locomotives have appeared and several more are due for delivery early in 1958. D-M. Swindon has now joined the various contractors in turning out the standard small shunting type. These locos. will in future (with the exception of d11176) bear numbers in the D.2XXX series. | SLS/195803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1920 | To Service | To service as Furness Railway Number 33 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22574 |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 12510 | ||
25/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 52510 | ||
08/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 52510 |