Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17805 Week
» 70821 Month
» 190348 Year
» 3217201 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
689 |
m/e |
12/1884 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17268 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57268 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
294 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3271 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 12/1884 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/10/1961 |
Service Life |
76 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1884 |
27A |
|
Polmadie |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
66A |
|
Polmadie |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1918 |
Unspecified rebuilding undertaken |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-40154 25/4; 40176 24/5; 40189 16/4; 40570 (3508) 22/4; 40613 (3465) 4/5; 40620 (3509) 6/5; 40624 (3957) 16/4; *40641 (3325) 20/4; 40664 (3515) 28/4; 40670 (3960) 17/5; 40689 (3533) 23/5; *41092 (2861) 28/4; 41132 (4148) 28/4; 41145 (4348) 16/4; 41176 (3529) 16/5; 41180 (3890) 8/4; 42201 5/4; 42415 23/4; 42417 13/5; 42751 (4188) 10/5; 42780 (4442) 20/5; 42802 (3310) 28/5; 42809 (3956) 21/5; 42830 (3772) 1/4; 42834 (3911) 7/4; 42876 (4211) 5/4; 43902 (2991) 14/5; 44330 (3825) 13/4;; 44795 (10685) 21/4; *44799 (10689) 5/5;; 44931 (10556) 11/5; *44959 (10584) 6/4; 44973 (10598) 29/4; 44991 (10616) 30/4; 45009 (9264) 7/5; 45013 (9511) 10/4; 45014 (9184) 28/4; *45087 (9724) 7/4; 45100 (9261) 26/5; 45115 (9278) 12/5; 45116 (9060) 15/4; *45119 (9365) 22/4; 45122 (9265) 8/4; 45124 (9214) 22/4; 45153 (9314) 28/4; 45157 (9545) 5/5; 45166 (9210) 28/4; 45167 (9181) 30/4; 45171 (9194) 17/5; 45177 (9659) 16/5; *45251 (9276) 2/4; 45357 (9534) 13/4; 45360 (9715) 23/4; 45389 (9625) 9/4; *45423 (9595) 8/4; *45456 (9059) 16/4; 45464 (9296) 30/5; 45469 (9596) 19/4; 45482 (9828) 24/5; 45487 (9833) 20/5; 45491 (9538) 23/5; *45577 (9027) 6/4; 45581 (9077) 12/4; 45715 (3944) 27/4; 45730 (9709) 22/4; 47163 20/4; 54438 (6057) 5/4; *54444 (2662) 16/4; 54445 (6062) 30/4; 54455 (6182) 20/5; *54471 (6178) 24/5; 55138 23/4; 55178 1/6; 55210 20/5; 55356 8/4; 56038 30/4; 56153 18/5; 56238 9/4; 56249 2/6; 56254 2/6; 56272 23/4; 56281 20/4; 56310 15/4; 56359 28/4; 57243 (927) 20/4;; 57261 (1757) 4/5;; 57268 (1659) 6/5;; 57289 (1738) 14/4;; 57291 (1741) 21/5; 57292 (1635) 26/5; *57298 (936) 30/4; 57307 (971) 11/5; 57310 (1231) 13/5; 57389 (1309) 25/5; 57464 (1327) 24/5; *57556 (1632) 24/5; 57562 (1643) 26/4; 57573 (1693) 7/5; 57588 (1669) 27/5; 57608 (1689) 12/5; 57631 (1712) 28/5; 57665 (1746) 19/4; 57695 (1874) 23/5. *Retains L.M.S. on tender. Nos. 4998 and 4999 entered the Varnish Shop on 17/5 and 18/5 respectively, where they have since been painted black with red, white and grey lining and re-numbered 44998 and 44999 in straw numerals. New smokebox number plates have also been fitted. No. M914 arrived at the Works on 4/5 with L.M.S. tender No. 3188, having exchanged its British Railways tender (4014) with engine No. 2910 at Corkerhill. The engine has since been renumbered 40914 (on 17/5) but retains L.M.S. on the tender. No. 56020 returned to the Works on 5/5 after running-in trials and was loaded on to a 40-ton well wagon on 12/5 and despatched, with its wheels and material in a 12-ton open wagon to Burton-on-Trent shed on 14/5. Nos. 16279 an 16341 arrived at the Works on 26/5 still retaining smokebox number plates-since removed |
SLS/194807 |
21/05/1955 |
Clyde Coast |
Of the batch of standard class 5 engines allotted to Polmadie, Nos. 73055-73064 all work alongside class 4 2-6-4 tanks on passenger duties. The latest arrivals are 73075/6 with large tenders. Standard 2-6-4 tanks now handle almost half of the Clyde Coast passenger traffic, the remainder being of Fairburn variety. No. 80023 spent a short while on loan recently to Ladyburn, likewise No. 80003 at Princes Pier, but none of these engines is as yet stationed at Greenock. Latest arrivals at Polmadie are Doncaster-built Nos. 80111/5. New light 2-6-0 of classes 3 and 4 appear on night freight duties from the Motherwell direction; No. 77009, for a time stabled at Greenock, is now at Polmadie, while No. 77008 is at Princes Pier on passenger duties. On 25th June, No. 76001, of Perth, appeared on an excursion from Glenboig to Gourock. Class 3F Nos. 57552/6 and class 2F No. 57268 still handle the principal freight turns from Greenock; Caley Bogies Nos. 54456 an 54506 appear quite regularly on freight duty and at the end of June No. 54497 emerged after being in store for over six months. On Friday, 1st July, a 'Starlight' special left Gourock for the south at 6.45 p.m., doubleheaded by Nos. 73057 an 72000. Earlier, the stock for this train had been worked down by compound No. 41155 of Ayr shed, a type now very rare on this line. |
SLS/195508 |
10/02/1962 |
Carnbroe dump |
Carnbroe dump (on former Hamilton NB line adjacent to CR main line): 55201/20/3/65/7/8, 56298/356, 57208/39/68/71/92, 57303/17/9/21/5/63/7/9/89, 57417/8/36/61/3, 57563/4/93, 57632/59/63/5, 68717. |
SLS/196203 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1884 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 689 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 3271 |
|
|
1918 |
Modification |
Modification: Unspecified rebuilding undertaken |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17268 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57268 |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
02/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57268 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|