Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 321 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18124 Week
» 71140 Month
» 190667 Year
» 3217520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
833 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17571 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57571 |
|
01/01/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. McIntosh |
Class |
812 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5616 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 30/04/1962 |
Service Life |
62 yrs , 5 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1899 |
30B |
|
Hurlford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63D |
|
Oban |
4w/e |
05/07/1958 |
66A |
|
Polmadie |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
30/04/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63D |
Oban |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
2w/e |
21/10/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1911 |
Steam heating apparatus |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 833 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5616 |
|
|
1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heating apparatus |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17571 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hurlford (30B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57571 |
|
|
05/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oban (63D) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57571 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |
|
|