30/04/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 61539/60, 62277, 4486, 65215/31, 5271, 5318, 67455, ex-L.M.S. 40670, 15176, 15269, 17241, 17396, 17609. |
SLS/195006 |
17/06/1961 |
Inverurie Works |
Inverurie Works scrap yard contained the following on 17th June-40574/94, 40611/22/88, 43868, 54482/8, 54505, 55198, 56246, 56376, 57232, 57324, 57552/4, 57609, 61784, 62495, 62671, 65285/95, 68459, 69136/43 and awaiting scrapping were 56240 an 65261. A number of these have not yet been withdrawn prior to 8th May! On 24th June extra arrivals were 62474/9 an 55185 whilst 54483 was on Ferryhill en route Inverurie. |
SLS/196107 |
04/07/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. |
SLS/196108 |
28/08/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard-remains only) |
Erecting Shop: D2412, D3550, D3934, D5329, D6149/56, 44281/3, 45136, 64548/59/61/86, 64612, 65931. Test Line: 44315, 64539. Works Sidings: D2417, D3547/53, D8028, 44183. Dead Line: 43902, 57572, 62682, 64636. Scrap Yard-intact: 40603, 55126, Scrap Yard-remains only: 40574/94, 40604/11/88, 43922, 55198, 56376, 57552/4, 57609, 62479, 64482, 64576. |
SLS/196110 |