Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 355 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18158 Week
» 71174 Month
» 190701 Year
» 3217554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4359 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
British Railways |
44359 |
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4359 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
27/05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44359 |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44359 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|